THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:41:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Delhi, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 715 Coronation Blvd
Suite 3
Cambridge ON N1R 7R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196202444
Fax: 5193529280

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR SWARNLATA SAROEY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saroey (CPSO#: 120164 ) Dr. P. Saroey (CPSO#: 117738 )
Business Address: 715 Coronation Boulevard
Suite 3
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7R1
5196202444

Corporation Name: SAROEY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 May 2024

Corporation Name: Dr Swarnlata Saroey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: Saroey Professional Medicine Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2022

Corporation Name: Dr. Swarnlata Saroey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Delhi, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 715 Coronation Blvd
Suite 3
Cambridge ON N1R 7R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196202444
Fax: 5193529280

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR SWARNLATA SAROEY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saroey (CPSO#: 120164 ) Dr. P. Saroey (CPSO#: 117738 )
Business Address: 715 Coronation Boulevard
Suite 3
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7R1
5196202444

Corporation Name: SAROEY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 May 2024

Corporation Name: Dr Swarnlata Saroey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: Saroey Professional Medicine Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2022

Corporation Name: Dr. Swarnlata Saroey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SWARNLATA SAROEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAROEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SWARNLATA SAROEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAROEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Delhi, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2019