THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:31:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1086 Saint Clair Avenue West
Regal Heights Medical Centre
Toronto Ontario M6E 1A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 410 0111
Fax: 416 410 1014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. KATSAP MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Katsap (CPSO#: 120186 )
Business Address: 1086 Saint Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6E 1A7
4164100111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1086 Saint Clair Avenue West
Regal Heights Medical Centre
Toronto Ontario M6E 1A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 410 0111
Fax: 416 410 1014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. KATSAP MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Katsap (CPSO#: 120186 )
Business Address: 1086 Saint Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6E 1A7
4164100111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JEFFREY KATSAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATSAP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JEFFREY KATSAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATSAP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2019