THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Belarusian State Medical University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 225 Mapleview Drive East
Barrie Ontario L4N 0W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-721-9386
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Wellington St E
Barrie ON L4M 2E1
Phone: 4167276331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yatsynovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yatsynovich (CPSO#: 120195 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Belarusian State Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 225 Mapleview Drive East
Barrie Ontario L4N 0W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-721-9386
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Wellington St E
Barrie ON L4M 2E1
Phone: 4167276331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yatsynovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yatsynovich (CPSO#: 120195 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SVIATLANA YATSYNOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YATSYNOVICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SVIATLANA YATSYNOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YATSYNOVICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Belarusian State Medical University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2019