THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:42:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3850 Finch Ave E
Pharma Grace Clinic
Scarborough ON M1T 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 298 2988
Fax: 416 298 3140
Address: 3319 Sheppard Ave E
Warden Family Practice and Walk-In
Scarborough ON M1T 3K2
Phone: 416 491 2999
Fax: 416 491 0009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manal Ekladious Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ekladious (CPSO#: 120202 )
Business Address: 3850 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1T 3T6
416 298 2988
Business Address: 101-3319 Sheppard Ave E
Warden Family Practice and Walk-in
Scarborough ON M1T 3K2
4164912999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3850 Finch Ave E
Pharma Grace Clinic
Scarborough ON M1T 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 298 2988
Fax: 416 298 3140
Address: 3319 Sheppard Ave E
Warden Family Practice and Walk-In
Scarborough ON M1T 3K2
Phone: 416 491 2999
Fax: 416 491 0009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manal Ekladious Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ekladious (CPSO#: 120202 )
Business Address: 3850 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1T 3T6
416 298 2988
Business Address: 101-3319 Sheppard Ave E
Warden Family Practice and Walk-in
Scarborough ON M1T 3K2
4164912999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANAL KHAIRY MONIB BOTROS EKLADIOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EKLADIOUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANAL KHAIRY MONIB BOTROS EKLADIOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EKLADIOUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2019