THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:22:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 Matheson Blvd W
Unit 101
Mississauga ON L5R 0H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6475771553
Fax: 6477776118
Address: 320 Matheson Blvd W
Mississauga ON L5R 0H2
Phone: 6475771553
Fax: (647) 777-6118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mustafa Al Khalidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Khalidi (CPSO#: 120257 )
Business Address: 680 Silver Creek Boulevard
Suite 8
Mississauga Ontario L5A 3Z1
(905) 277-3277
Business Address: 320 Matheson Blvd W
Mississauga ON L5R 0H2
6475771553

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 Matheson Blvd W
Unit 101
Mississauga ON L5R 0H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6475771553
Fax: 6477776118
Address: 320 Matheson Blvd W
Mississauga ON L5R 0H2
Phone: 6475771553
Fax: (647) 777-6118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mustafa Al Khalidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Khalidi (CPSO#: 120257 )
Business Address: 680 Silver Creek Boulevard
Suite 8
Mississauga Ontario L5A 3Z1
(905) 277-3277
Business Address: 320 Matheson Blvd W
Mississauga ON L5R 0H2
6475771553

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUSTAFA MOHAMMED AL-KHALIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-KHALIDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUSTAFA MOHAMMED AL-KHALIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-KHALIDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2019