THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:33:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Medical Center
101 - 1520 Steeles Ave W
Concord Ontario L4K 3B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-4457
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AMBARTSUMYAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ambartsumyan (CPSO#: 120259 )
Business Address: unit 101a-1520 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 3B9
(905) 597-4457

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Medical Center
101 - 1520 Steeles Ave W
Concord Ontario L4K 3B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-4457
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AMBARTSUMYAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ambartsumyan (CPSO#: 120259 )
Business Address: unit 101a-1520 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 3B9
(905) 597-4457

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBEN AMBARTSUMYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBARTSUMYAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBEN AMBARTSUMYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBARTSUMYAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019