THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:45:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Khyber Medical University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cedarbrae Medical Center
3630 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1G 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehwish Asad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asad (CPSO#: 120267 )
Business Address: Cedarbrae Medical Center
3630 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1G 1P6
(416) 901-6370

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Khyber Medical University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cedarbrae Medical Center
3630 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1G 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehwish Asad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asad (CPSO#: 120267 )
Business Address: Cedarbrae Medical Center
3630 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1G 1P6
(416) 901-6370

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHWISH ASAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHWISH ASAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Khyber Medical University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019