THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:59:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wise Elephant FHO
4A - 2 Kennedy Rd S
Brampton Ontario L6W 3E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054594385
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. FARKHANDA RASHID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rashid (CPSO#: 120272 )
Business Address: 2 Kennedy Rd S
Brampton ON L6W 3E1
289-323-0660

Corporation Name: Rashid Mazoor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Mar 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wise Elephant FHO
4A - 2 Kennedy Rd S
Brampton Ontario L6W 3E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054594385
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. FARKHANDA RASHID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rashid (CPSO#: 120272 )
Business Address: 2 Kennedy Rd S
Brampton ON L6W 3E1
289-323-0660

Corporation Name: Rashid Mazoor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Mar 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARKHANDA RASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARKHANDA RASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019