THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:37:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-9990 The Gore Rd
Brampton ON L6P 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 913-9130
Fax: (905) 913-2525

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parminder Kaur Luthra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Luthra (CPSO#: 120274 )
Business Address: 1090 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Suite 102
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B3
(905) 790-8400
Business Address: 105-9990 The Gore Rd
Brampton ON L6P 4L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-9990 The Gore Rd
Brampton ON L6P 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 913-9130
Fax: (905) 913-2525

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parminder Kaur Luthra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Luthra (CPSO#: 120274 )
Business Address: 1090 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Suite 102
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B3
(905) 790-8400
Business Address: 105-9990 The Gore Rd
Brampton ON L6P 4L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARMINDER KAUR LUTHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTHRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARMINDER KAUR LUTHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTHRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Sep 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019