THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:44:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106 - 2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1X 0C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahbaz Jamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jamal (CPSO#: 120276 )
Business Address: 2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
4162935454

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106 - 2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1X 0C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahbaz Jamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jamal (CPSO#: 120276 )
Business Address: 2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
4162935454

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jun 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 23 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHAHBAZ JAMAL may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHAHBAZ JAMAL may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Aug 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2019