THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:43:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Touro College of Osteopathic Medicine NY, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: TRUSTCARE MEDICAL CLINIC
450 Westheights Drive Unit 18B
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-279-4185
Fax: 519-279-4181

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.J. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shah (CPSO#: 120299 )
Business Address: TRUSTCARE MEDICAL CLINIC
450 Westheights Drive
Unit 18B
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2B9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Touro College of Osteopathic Medicine NY, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: TRUSTCARE MEDICAL CLINIC
450 Westheights Drive Unit 18B
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-279-4185
Fax: 519-279-4181

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.J. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shah (CPSO#: 120299 )
Business Address: TRUSTCARE MEDICAL CLINIC
450 Westheights Drive
Unit 18B
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2B9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYED JIBRAN SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYED JIBRAN SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Touro College of Osteopathic Medicine NY, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2020