THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:07:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bushehr University of Medical Sciences, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 935 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-635-6060
Fax: 416-764-5620

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Feb 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SASAN IRAJI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Iraji (CPSO#: 120300 )
Business Address: 935 Sheppard Ave W
Unit 1
North York ON M3H 2T7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Bushehr University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 935 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-635-6060
Fax: 416-764-5620

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Feb 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SASAN IRAJI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Iraji (CPSO#: 120300 )
Business Address: 935 Sheppard Ave W
Unit 1
North York ON M3H 2T7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SASAN IRAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRAJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SASAN IRAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRAJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bushehr University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2019