THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:21:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210-4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)751-3308
Fax: (416) 298-9715
Address: 90 Scottfield Drive
Yee Hong Medical Centre
Toronto Ontario M1S 5W4
Phone: 4169404818
Fax: 4162984672

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Iowa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kelly R. Tse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tse (CPSO#: 120309 )
Business Address: 210-4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 1T7
(416) 751-3308

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210-4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)751-3308
Fax: (416) 298-9715
Address: 90 Scottfield Drive
Yee Hong Medical Centre
Toronto Ontario M1S 5W4
Phone: 4169404818
Fax: 4162984672

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Iowa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kelly R. Tse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tse (CPSO#: 120309 )
Business Address: 210-4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 1T7
(416) 751-3308

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY REBECCA TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY REBECCA TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2019