THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:52:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 402-1110 Sheppard Ave E
NeuroCare - NN&BH
North York ON M2K 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 224-1922
Fax: (416) 224-0056
Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital Epilepsy Clinic
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5800
Extension: 5055
Fax: 416-603-5768

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A Purohit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Purohit (CPSO#: 120342 )
Business Address: 100-2939 Portland Dr
Oakville ON L6H 5S4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 402-1110 Sheppard Ave E
NeuroCare - NN&BH
North York ON M2K 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 224-1922
Fax: (416) 224-0056
Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital Epilepsy Clinic
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5800
Extension: 5055
Fax: 416-603-5768

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A Purohit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Purohit (CPSO#: 120342 )
Business Address: 100-2939 Portland Dr
Oakville ON L6H 5S4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABHISHEK NIMISH PUROHIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUROHIT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABHISHEK NIMISH PUROHIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUROHIT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2019