THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 08:00:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163505900
Fax: 4163505981
Address: 75 Ann St
.
.
.
Bracebridge ON P1L 2E4
Phone: 6472742842
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: COURTNEY POTTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Potts (CPSO#: 120343 )
Business Address: 15 Lower Jarvis St
4202
Toronto ON M5E 0C4
647-274-2842

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163505900
Fax: 4163505981
Address: 75 Ann St
.
.
.
Bracebridge ON P1L 2E4
Phone: 6472742842
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: COURTNEY POTTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Potts (CPSO#: 120343 )
Business Address: 15 Lower Jarvis St
4202
Toronto ON M5E 0C4
647-274-2842

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COURTNEY LEIGH POTTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COURTNEY LEIGH POTTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2019