THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:05:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Puja Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chopra (CPSO#: 120348 )
Business Address: Apartment number 2018
1333 Bloor St
Mississauga ON L4Y 3T6
4033783096
Business Address: 1209-1 Elm Drive West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Puja Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chopra (CPSO#: 120348 )
Business Address: Apartment number 2018
1333 Bloor St
Mississauga ON L4Y 3T6
4033783096
Business Address: 1209-1 Elm Drive West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUJA CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUJA CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2022
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2020