THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:47:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Louis University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 York Mills Road, Suite 214
Toronto Ontario M2P2G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)449-9983
Fax: (416)449-4578

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 05 Apr 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Priya Kesarwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kesarwani (CPSO#: 120379 )
Business Address: 10 York Mills Road
Suite 214
Toronto Ontario M2P 2G4
(416) 449-9983

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Louis University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 York Mills Road, Suite 214
Toronto Ontario M2P2G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)449-9983
Fax: (416)449-4578

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 05 Apr 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Priya Kesarwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kesarwani (CPSO#: 120379 )
Business Address: 10 York Mills Road
Suite 214
Toronto Ontario M2P 2G4
(416) 449-9983

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA KESARWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESARWANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA KESARWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESARWANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Louis University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2020