THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Highland Rd W
Kitchener ON N2M 3B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-3600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wisam Khalil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Khalil (CPSO#: 120387 )
Business Address: 5-100 Highland Rd W
Kitchener ON N2M 3B5
Business Address: 3-521 Highway 8
Stoney Creek ON L8G 1G4
(905) 662-2777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Highland Rd W
Kitchener ON N2M 3B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-3600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wisam Khalil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Khalil (CPSO#: 120387 )
Business Address: 5-100 Highland Rd W
Kitchener ON N2M 3B5
Business Address: 3-521 Highway 8
Stoney Creek ON L8G 1G4
(905) 662-2777

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 May 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 07 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. WISAM KHALIL may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. WISAM KHALIL may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2020