THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:45:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: Bajwa, Jessica Asnani (Used Until: 16 Sep 2024)
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centro Healthcare Medical Clinic
114 - 7777 Weston Rd
Vaughan Ontario L4L 0G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 605-4744
Fax: (416) 987-0585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asnani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Asnani (CPSO#: 120390 )
Business Address: 7777 Weston Road
Suite 114
Vaughan Ontario L4L 0G9

General Information

Former Name: Bajwa, Jessica Asnani (Used Until: 16 Sep 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centro Healthcare Medical Clinic
114 - 7777 Weston Rd
Vaughan Ontario L4L 0G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 605-4744
Fax: (416) 987-0585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asnani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Asnani (CPSO#: 120390 )
Business Address: 7777 Weston Road
Suite 114
Vaughan Ontario L4L 0G9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 May 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 26 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JESSICA ASNANI may practise medicine independently in family medicine and low risk non-surgical cosmetic procedures.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JESSICA ASNANI may practise medicine independently in family medicine and low risk non-surgical cosmetic procedures.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 May 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 May 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2020