THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 06:05:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 5777 Stn B
St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor st.
London ON N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 66093
Fax: (519) 646-6130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rocio Sedano Munoz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sedano Munoz (CPSO#: 120398 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 5777 Stn B
St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor st.
London ON N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 66093
Fax: (519) 646-6130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rocio Sedano Munoz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sedano Munoz (CPSO#: 120398 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Feb 2024
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ROCIO NATALIA SEDANO MUNOZ may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, Western University, in which Dr. SEDANO MUNOZ holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SEDANO MUNOZ no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SEDANO MUNOZ’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SEDANO MUNOZ’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 February, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. SEDANO MUNOZ's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ROCIO NATALIA SEDANO MUNOZ may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, Western University, in which Dr. SEDANO MUNOZ holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SEDANO MUNOZ no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SEDANO MUNOZ’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SEDANO MUNOZ’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 February, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. SEDANO MUNOZ's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Jan 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2020