THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:10:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 38002
Fax: 905-721-4877
Address: 11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Extension: 504
Fax: (289) 731-2071
Address: 300 Gordon St
Lakeridge Health Whitby
Positive Care Clinic
Whitby ON L1N 5T2
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 53127
Fax: 905-665-2409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Kleinman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kleinman (CPSO#: 120399 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Address: 300 Gordon St
Whitby ON L1N 5T2
Business Address: 11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 38002
Fax: 905-721-4877
Address: 11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Extension: 504
Fax: (289) 731-2071
Address: 300 Gordon St
Lakeridge Health Whitby
Positive Care Clinic
Whitby ON L1N 5T2
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 53127
Fax: 905-665-2409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Kleinman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kleinman (CPSO#: 120399 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Address: 300 Gordon St
Whitby ON L1N 5T2
Business Address: 11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RYAN KLEINMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEINMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RYAN KLEINMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEINMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2020