THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gloucester Family Health Centre
2 Lorry Greenberg Drive, Unit 4
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-736-6646
Fax: 613-736-6712

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MIRDAVOUDI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mirdavoudi (CPSO#: 120427 )
Business Address: 2 Lorry Greenberg Drive
Unit 4
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5H6
6137366646

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gloucester Family Health Centre
2 Lorry Greenberg Drive, Unit 4
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-736-6646
Fax: 613-736-6712

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MIRDAVOUDI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mirdavoudi (CPSO#: 120427 )
Business Address: 2 Lorry Greenberg Drive
Unit 4
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5H6
6137366646

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VEERA A MIRDAVOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRDAVOUDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VEERA A MIRDAVOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRDAVOUDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2020