THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:30:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Milner Ave
McCowan Medical Clinic
Scarborough ON M1S 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162930275
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dar (CPSO#: 120429 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Milner Ave
McCowan Medical Clinic
Scarborough ON M1S 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162930275
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dar (CPSO#: 120429 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEERAH KHUSHIA DAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEERAH KHUSHIA DAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2020