THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:26:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHRISTOPHER NOLAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nolan (CPSO#: 120438 )
Business Address: 31 Frederick Street
Orillia Ontario L3V 5W5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHRISTOPHER NOLAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nolan (CPSO#: 120438 )
Business Address: 31 Frederick Street
Orillia Ontario L3V 5W5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PETER ROY NOLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOLAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PETER ROY NOLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOLAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Apr 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2020