THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9560 Markham Rd
MARKHAM CENTRAL CLINIC
Units 101-104
Markham ON L6E 0V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-8888
Fax: 888-405-2809

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Malouka Abdelmalak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malouka Abdelmalak (CPSO#: 120450 )
Business Address: 9560 Markham Rd
UNITS 101-104
MARKHAM CENTRAL CLINIC
Markham ON L6E 0V1
9054728888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9560 Markham Rd
MARKHAM CENTRAL CLINIC
Units 101-104
Markham ON L6E 0V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-8888
Fax: 888-405-2809

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Malouka Abdelmalak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malouka Abdelmalak (CPSO#: 120450 )
Business Address: 9560 Markham Rd
UNITS 101-104
MARKHAM CENTRAL CLINIC
Markham ON L6E 0V1
9054728888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABER ABDELMALAK MALOUKA ABDELMALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALOUKA ABDELMALAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABER ABDELMALAK MALOUKA ABDELMALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALOUKA ABDELMALAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2020