THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:50:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Kennedy Rd South Unit 4A
Brampton Ontario L6W 3E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-459-4385
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-5 Yorkland Blvd
Vanrose Medical Centre
Brampton ON L6P 4N3
Phone: 2897482450
Fax: 2897482451

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Garry Mann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mann (CPSO#: 120468 )
Business Address: 14 Slipneedle St
Brampton ON L6S 6L4
1 647 321 3435

Corporation Name: Garry Mann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Kennedy Rd South Unit 4A
Brampton Ontario L6W 3E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-459-4385
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-5 Yorkland Blvd
Vanrose Medical Centre
Brampton ON L6P 4N3
Phone: 2897482450
Fax: 2897482451

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Garry Mann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mann (CPSO#: 120468 )
Business Address: 14 Slipneedle St
Brampton ON L6S 6L4
1 647 321 3435

Corporation Name: Garry Mann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARRY MANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARRY MANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2020