THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:01:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building
Suite 4S-406
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-259-6583
Fax: 437-826-7763
Address: 123 Edward Street
Toronto Sleep & Pulmonary Centre
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-260-3203
Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6043
Fax: 416-530-6050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building
Suite 4S-406
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-259-6583
Fax: 437-826-7763
Address: 123 Edward Street
Toronto Sleep & Pulmonary Centre
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-260-3203
Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6043
Fax: 416-530-6050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN NOAH SUGARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUGARMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN NOAH SUGARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUGARMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2020