THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:46:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 352-6401
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jul 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Beg (CPSO#: 120472 )
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(989) 392-0604

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 352-6401
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jul 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Beg (CPSO#: 120472 )
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(989) 392-0604

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jun 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 23 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHAFIA BEG may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHAFIA BEG may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2020