THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade de Antofagasta, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidade de Antofagasta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade de Antofagasta, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
10 Feb 2025 to 29 Apr 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 09 Feb 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
10 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 09 Feb 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
10 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 09 Feb 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
10 Feb 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 09 Feb 2021
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
30 Apr 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
10 Feb 2020 to 29 Apr 2020
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 10 Feb 2025 to 29 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 09 Feb 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 10 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 09 Feb 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 10 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 09 Feb 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 10 Feb 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 09 Feb 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 30 Apr 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 10 Feb 2020 to 29 Apr 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Apr 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2020