THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:57:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Liaquat University of Med & Health Sci, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-120 Main Street West
McMaster Children's Hospital- Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3432624132
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Alder Hey Hospital
Eaton Road
West Derby
Liverpool Merseyside United Kingdom L12 2AP
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M DANISH BARAKZAI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Barakzai (CPSO#: 120512 )
Business Address: 20-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
905-521-2100 Extn: 76807

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Liaquat University of Med & Health Sci, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-120 Main Street West
McMaster Children's Hospital- Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3432624132
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Alder Hey Hospital
Eaton Road
West Derby
Liverpool Merseyside United Kingdom L12 2AP
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M DANISH BARAKZAI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Barakzai (CPSO#: 120512 )
Business Address: 20-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
905-521-2100 Extn: 76807

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Sep 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MUHAMMAD DANISH BARAKZAI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, Division of Radiology/Pediatric Interventional Radiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. BARAKZAI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BARAKZAI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BARAKZAI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BARAKZAI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 September, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. BARAKZAI's academic appointment at the McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MUHAMMAD DANISH BARAKZAI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, Division of Radiology/Pediatric Interventional Radiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. BARAKZAI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BARAKZAI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BARAKZAI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BARAKZAI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 September, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. BARAKZAI's academic appointment at the McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Liaquat University of Med & Health Sci, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2020