THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2A-8000 Bathurst St
Thornhill ON L4J 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-709-9709
Fax: 905-709-9701

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALLEN PIMIENTA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pimienta (CPSO#: 120542 )
Business Address: 2A-8000 Bathurst St
Thornhill ON L4J 0B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2A-8000 Bathurst St
Thornhill ON L4J 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-709-9709
Fax: 905-709-9701

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALLEN PIMIENTA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pimienta (CPSO#: 120542 )
Business Address: 2A-8000 Bathurst St
Thornhill ON L4J 0B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN LAWRENCE PIMIENTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIMIENTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN LAWRENCE PIMIENTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIMIENTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2020