THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5400 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-356-6333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Centrepointe Medical Centre
Suite 102
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6E2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Iraq

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. TARIQ AL-SHUJAIRI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Al-Shujairi (CPSO#: 120555 )
Business Address: 3138 Jenn Ave
Burlington ON L7M 0J1
6478921971

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5400 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-356-6333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Centrepointe Medical Centre
Suite 102
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6E2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Iraq

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. TARIQ AL-SHUJAIRI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Al-Shujairi (CPSO#: 120555 )
Business Address: 3138 Jenn Ave
Burlington ON L7M 0J1
6478921971

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIQ ABADI HUMOOD AL-SHUJAIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHUJAIRI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIQ ABADI HUMOOD AL-SHUJAIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHUJAIRI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2020