THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204 Hamilton Rd
London ON N5Z 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-686-7266
Fax: 5192042333

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.O. Nwangwu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nwangwu (CPSO#: 120559 )
Business Address: 204 Hamilton Road
London Ontario N5Z 1R1
(250) 618-7182

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204 Hamilton Rd
London ON N5Z 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-686-7266
Fax: 5192042333

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.O. Nwangwu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nwangwu (CPSO#: 120559 )
Business Address: 204 Hamilton Road
London Ontario N5Z 1R1
(250) 618-7182

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHINEDU ONYEBUCHI NWANGWU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWANGWU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHINEDU ONYEBUCHI NWANGWU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWANGWU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2020