THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:53:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
CHEO
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2703
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 402-2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
Phone: 3438826766
Fax: 3438826768

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joshua Smalley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Smalley (CPSO#: 120565 )
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
CHEO
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2703
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 402-2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
Phone: 3438826766
Fax: 3438826768

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joshua Smalley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Smalley (CPSO#: 120565 )
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA GEORGE SMALLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA GEORGE SMALLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2020