THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:40:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Heart Institute
201-2464 Howard Ave
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 977-6643
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Anchan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Anchan (CPSO#: 120587 )
Business Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 201
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
519-977-6643

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Heart Institute
201-2464 Howard Ave
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 977-6643
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Anchan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Anchan (CPSO#: 120587 )
Business Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 201
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
519-977-6643

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY JOHN ANCHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANCHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY JOHN ANCHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANCHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2020