THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:54:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-1525 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167411622
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sinan Qasha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qasha (CPSO#: 120588 )
Business Address: 304-1525 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-1525 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167411622
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sinan Qasha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qasha (CPSO#: 120588 )
Business Address: 304-1525 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SINAN QASHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QASHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SINAN QASHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QASHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2020