THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ilorin, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bonavista Medical Centre
104-265 King George Rd
Brantford Ontario N3R 6Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197594060
Fax: 5197598807

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 May 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR AYODEJI OLUBANIYI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Olubaniyi (CPSO#: 120612 )
Business Address: 104-265 King George Rd
Brantford ON N3R 6Y1
519-759-4060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ilorin, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bonavista Medical Centre
104-265 King George Rd
Brantford Ontario N3R 6Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197594060
Fax: 5197598807

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 May 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR AYODEJI OLUBANIYI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Olubaniyi (CPSO#: 120612 )
Business Address: 104-265 King George Rd
Brantford ON N3R 6Y1
519-759-4060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYODEJI OLUFEMI OLUBANIYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLUBANIYI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYODEJI OLUFEMI OLUBANIYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLUBANIYI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ilorin, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2020