THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:39:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Citrus Medical Centre
101 - 605 Royal York Rd
Toronto Ontario M8Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 800 6500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Citrus Medical Centre
107 - 2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Toronto Ontario M8V 0B1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ravinder Lall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lall (CPSO#: 120617 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Citrus Medical Centre
101 - 605 Royal York Rd
Toronto Ontario M8Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 800 6500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Citrus Medical Centre
107 - 2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Toronto Ontario M8V 0B1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ravinder Lall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lall (CPSO#: 120617 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVINDER SINGH LALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVINDER SINGH LALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2020