THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:27:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1505 Guelph Line
Elroi Medical Center
Unit 18
Burlington ON L7P 3B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053357474
Fax: 9053367474
Address: 229 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1B6
Phone: 19058698342
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph’s healthcare Hamilton
Family Medicine
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055221155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Apr 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Atse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Atse (CPSO#: 120636 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1505 Guelph Line
Elroi Medical Center
Unit 18
Burlington ON L7P 3B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053357474
Fax: 9053367474
Address: 229 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1B6
Phone: 19058698342
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph’s healthcare Hamilton
Family Medicine
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055221155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Apr 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Atse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Atse (CPSO#: 120636 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMEMINE BARBARA ATSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMEMINE BARBARA ATSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2020