THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:05:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15 Queens Quay East
Unit 102
Toronto Ontario M5E 0C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163662273
Fax: 4163665665
Address: 13291 Yonge St
Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: 9057731325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Mar 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 24 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Serbanescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Serbanescu (CPSO#: 120642 )
Business Address: 102-15 Queens Quay E
Toronto ON M5E 0C5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15 Queens Quay East
Unit 102
Toronto Ontario M5E 0C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163662273
Fax: 4163665665
Address: 13291 Yonge St
Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: 9057731325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Mar 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 24 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Serbanescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Serbanescu (CPSO#: 120642 )
Business Address: 102-15 Queens Quay E
Toronto ON M5E 0C5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Aug 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 05 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALEXANDER SERBANESCU may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALEXANDER SERBANESCU may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2020