THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:13:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Aleppo, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310-1193 Fischer Hallman Rd
St. George Medical Center
Kitchener ON N2R 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-593-1004
Extension: 101
Fax: 888-532-4295
Address: 104-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge Medical Specialists
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8
Phone: 226-895-1252
Fax: 519-220-1170

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmad Tarakji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tarakji (CPSO#: 120648 )
Business Address: C14-155 Highland Cres
Kitchener ON N2M 0A1
519-578-2770
Business Address: 65 Westmount Road North
Unit 805
65 Westmount Rd North
Waterloo Ontario N2L 6P5
9022227861

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Aleppo, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310-1193 Fischer Hallman Rd
St. George Medical Center
Kitchener ON N2R 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-593-1004
Extension: 101
Fax: 888-532-4295
Address: 104-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge Medical Specialists
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8
Phone: 226-895-1252
Fax: 519-220-1170

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmad Tarakji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tarakji (CPSO#: 120648 )
Business Address: C14-155 Highland Cres
Kitchener ON N2M 0A1
519-578-2770
Business Address: 65 Westmount Road North
Unit 805
65 Westmount Rd North
Waterloo Ontario N2L 6P5
9022227861

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD RAED TARAKJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARAKJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD RAED TARAKJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARAKJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Aleppo, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2020