THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:15:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-815-8914
Fax: 905-815-8920

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 02 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chantal Tian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tian (CPSO#: 120668 )
Business Address: 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
905-815-8914
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-815-8914
Fax: 905-815-8920

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 02 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chantal Tian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tian (CPSO#: 120668 )
Business Address: 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
905-815-8914
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTAL TIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTAL TIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2020