THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 16:32:44 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-376-2121
Extension: 2490
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Del Priore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Del Priore (CPSO#: 120682 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-376-2121
Extension: 2490
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Del Priore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Del Priore (CPSO#: 120682 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Oct 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 18 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANGELA DEL PRIORE may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANGELA DEL PRIORE may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2020