THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:00:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KMH Cardiology Centre Inc
2075 Hadwen Rd
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Perras Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Perras (CPSO#: 120711 )
Business Address: 2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2L3
(905) 855-1860

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KMH Cardiology Centre Inc
2075 Hadwen Rd
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Perras Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Perras (CPSO#: 120711 )
Business Address: 2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2L3
(905) 855-1860

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Nov 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 26 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL WILLIAM DOUGLAS PERRAS may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL WILLIAM DOUGLAS PERRAS may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Nov 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020