THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Conklin Rd
Brantford ON N3T 0N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197593030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Ghazalah medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ghazalah (CPSO#: 120712 )
Business Address: A101-360 Conklin Rd
Brantford ON N3T 0N5
Business Address: 969 Upper Ottawa St
Hamilton ON L8T 4V9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Conklin Rd
Brantford ON N3T 0N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197593030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Ghazalah medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ghazalah (CPSO#: 120712 )
Business Address: A101-360 Conklin Rd
Brantford ON N3T 0N5
Business Address: 969 Upper Ottawa St
Hamilton ON L8T 4V9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASSAM ADIL ABDULLA GHAZALAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZALAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASSAM ADIL ABDULLA GHAZALAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZALAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 May 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 May 2020