THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15 Henderson Street
Port Hope Ontario L1A 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-207-3200
Fax: 855-755-7771
Address: IMCare
1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg ON K9A 2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: HeartCare
372 King St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2J9
Phone: 905-721-1999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saeidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Saeidi (CPSO#: 120752 )
Business Address: 372 King St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2J9
289-207-3211
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
289-207-3211

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15 Henderson Street
Port Hope Ontario L1A 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-207-3200
Fax: 855-755-7771
Address: IMCare
1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg ON K9A 2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: HeartCare
372 King St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2J9
Phone: 905-721-1999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saeidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Saeidi (CPSO#: 120752 )
Business Address: 372 King St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2J9
289-207-3211
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
289-207-3211

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jun 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 23 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. BEHTASH SAEIDI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. BEHTASH SAEIDI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020