THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Deacon St
C338-201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-3675
Extension: 6720
Fax: 613 775 0433

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 25 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathaniel C Abutu Medicine professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abutu (CPSO#: 120754 )
Business Address: 201 Deacon St
3rd Floor Tower C
613-732-3675 Extn: 6720

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Deacon St
C338-201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-3675
Extension: 6720
Fax: 613 775 0433

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 25 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathaniel C Abutu Medicine professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abutu (CPSO#: 120754 )
Business Address: 201 Deacon St
3rd Floor Tower C
613-732-3675 Extn: 6720

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHANIEL COMMANDER ABUTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUTU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHANIEL COMMANDER ABUTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUTU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2020