THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:38:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9-30 McNaughton Ave
Wallaceburg ON N8A 1R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196271497
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9-30 McNaughton Ave
Wallaceburg ON N8A 1R9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Kerubo Workman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Workman (CPSO#: 120787 )
Business Address: 30 McNaughton Avenue
Unit 9
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 1R9

Corporation Name: ANGELA KERUBO WORKMAN MEDICINE PROFESSINAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Workman (CPSO#: 120787 )
Business Address: 30 McNaughton Avenue
30
mcnaughton avenue
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 1N9
519-627-1497

Corporation Name: ANGELA KERUBO WORKMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9-30 McNaughton Ave
Wallaceburg ON N8A 1R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196271497
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9-30 McNaughton Ave
Wallaceburg ON N8A 1R9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Kerubo Workman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Workman (CPSO#: 120787 )
Business Address: 30 McNaughton Avenue
Unit 9
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 1R9

Corporation Name: ANGELA KERUBO WORKMAN MEDICINE PROFESSINAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Workman (CPSO#: 120787 )
Business Address: 30 McNaughton Avenue
30
mcnaughton avenue
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 1N9
519-627-1497

Corporation Name: ANGELA KERUBO WORKMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA KERUBO WORKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORKMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA KERUBO WORKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORKMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020