THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:37:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 2204, South Tower
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237100
Extension: 4848
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KENNETH BEVISS-CHALLINOR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Beviss-Challinor (CPSO#: 120835 )
Business Address: 1970 South Lane Rd
Sudbury ON P3G 1C8
4377787871

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 2204, South Tower
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237100
Extension: 4848
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KENNETH BEVISS-CHALLINOR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Beviss-Challinor (CPSO#: 120835 )
Business Address: 1970 South Lane Rd
Sudbury ON P3G 1C8
4377787871

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH BRODRICK BEVISS-CHALLINOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEVISS-CHALLINOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH BRODRICK BEVISS-CHALLINOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEVISS-CHALLINOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020