THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:19:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4335 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M9C 2A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166958878
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3476 Glen Erin Drive
3476
Glen Erin Dr
230
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R4
Phone: 9059972700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NEGAR DORRAJ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dorraj (CPSO#: 120844 )
Business Address: 460 Springbank Dr
London ON N6J 0A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4335 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M9C 2A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166958878
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3476 Glen Erin Drive
3476
Glen Erin Dr
230
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R4
Phone: 9059972700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NEGAR DORRAJ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dorraj (CPSO#: 120844 )
Business Address: 460 Springbank Dr
London ON N6J 0A8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEGAR DORRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORRAJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEGAR DORRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORRAJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020